THE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 300921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £18.01k £15.41k £12.96k £13.81k £19.70k
Total expenditure £14.15k £17.75k £11.87k £13.51k £13.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A £10.00k