Trustees VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE CHRISTINE HICKEN | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNA TROTTER | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNA JESSE | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE DENNIS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROSE TRIPP | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA KATHRYN NORRIS | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JONES | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET SAMUEL | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE TITCHEN | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Edwards | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MOODY | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN FRANKHAM | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARA SMALE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE MAUNDER | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER BROMELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROSEMARIE HOLDER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.