Trustees WALKHAMPTON MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 301006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheila Reynolds | Chair | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fred Henrey Glanville | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen France | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Giles France | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Courtney Glanville | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Spry | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Glanville | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Grace Louise Neal | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Glanville | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Veronica Walsh | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN WEST | Trustee | 30 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Peter Coombs Shapcott | Trustee | 01 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
LINDA LANDICK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.