Accounts and annual returns FIRST PLYMOUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 301058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 June 2019 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 May 2018 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required