1ST SID VALE (SIDMOUTH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 301076
Charity reporting is 359 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not yet received
359 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not yet received
359 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 June 2017 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 June 2017 135 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 18 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 01 February 2016 1 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)