Governing document DORCHESTER COMMUNITY NURSERY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 301124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/1967 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/1970 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/1971 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1991 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2011 as amended on 16 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN OF DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.