Trustees GESTINGTHORPE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Elisabeth Green | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damian Prior | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Smith | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Suzanne Bagby | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Quick | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Myra Quick | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bagby | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Craig | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Nice | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER FRANK GOLDSMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.