Trustees ABRIDGE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE ELLEN MYSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tom Hockley | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Day | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Harris | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kellie Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Garner | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Drewe | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Harding | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Hand | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Danny Blain | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN GWYNNETH COMBER | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Drewe | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Fennell | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD FOURACRES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALBERT HENRY WILLIAM WORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.