Trustees VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN GOLDING | Chair | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christine Packer | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Fray | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Merryweather | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victor Goodey | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Turner | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hull | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Walton | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Eversden | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN BUTCHER | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE MILLS | Trustee | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ann Golding | Trustee | 10 October 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.