Trustees IRON ACTON PARISH HALL
Charity number: 301553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Ann Mee | Chair | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annie Smith | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Smith | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Wright | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Hunt | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Weldrake | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Patrick Barker | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Sharp | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Rickard | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Spencer Bourns | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Anne Conner | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smith | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Margaret Byrne | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PATRICIA GADSBY | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN HILARY WILTSHIRE | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN MILLWARD | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MERYL COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER GOUGH HEAL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.