Trustees QUENINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcus Marshall Courtney | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Betty May Knights | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Margaret Grosscurth | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ray Peter Sheldon | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Sylvia Trafford | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JOSEPH DOOLEY | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DONALD FURNEAUX SWEETING | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.