Trustees PARISH HALL
Charity number: 301847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Catherine Humphrey | Chair | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Pettman | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Atkins | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna White-Smith | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Robert Felton Peel | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Stephen Winter Prutton | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Maria de Jesus Ferreira Large | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Adler | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LITTLE | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
EMMA MARTIN | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.