Trustees PAMBER HEATH WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 301914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Escott-New | Chair | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Nash | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Harmer | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susie Pickett | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MCGARVIE | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Donna Bluck | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Parker-Schwarz | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Marshall | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Marshall | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Davies | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Pauline Day | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
HILARY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.