PARISH HALL

Charity number: 301934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £18.92k £20.12k £19.32k £18.29k £17.12k
Total expenditure £11.16k £12.14k £15.94k £57.54k £7.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £144 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 £750 £750 £750 £10.00k