30TH LOUGHTON SCOUT GROUP (ST JOHN THE BAPTIST)

Charity number: 302039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.09k £19.45k £23.97k £24.11k £20.38k
Total expenditure £15.97k £17.12k £19.72k £13.33k £12.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A