Trustees RANDWICK SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Riley | Chair | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Marian Reed | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Frazer | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Castle | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Denise Barton-Foreman | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex Bingle | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Harriet Vasey | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Blanch | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BURNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE LITTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.