1ST WINTERBOURNE DOWN AND BURYSIDE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.36k £9.53k £20.25k £17.20k £21.62k
Total expenditure £10.73k £6.64k £20.21k £20.29k £18.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £500 N/A N/A