Financial history KINGSWOOD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £30.03k £23.77k £37.48k £23.56k £23.79k
Total expenditure £27.48k £23.50k £30.56k £31.82k £12.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.02k