Accounts and annual returns 28TH KINGSWOOD (1ST DOWNEND) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302157
Charity reporting is overdue by 445 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 80 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 80 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 445 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 445 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2022 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2022 | 605 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 September 2022 | 970 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window