Accounts and annual returns 2ND FAREHAM SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 September 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 September 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 January 2020 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 January 2020 88 days late Download Open in new window