Trustees 21ST ROMSEY (NURSLING AND ROWNHAMS) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Helen Fouch | Chair | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Cowley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo-Ann Ray | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Nash | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Wilkins | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Batchelor | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Jane Cooper | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Orriss | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Biondani | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Beale | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian McKay | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Terry Elliott | Trustee | 12 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
KERRIE BOWERS | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jason Phelps | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|||||
RANDELL JOHN WILLIAM MCKAY | Trustee | 01 September 2003 |
|
|
||||
SHARON LOUISE ARCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.