Trustees 5th Testwood Scout Group

Charity number: 302291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hayley Simes Chair 18 October 2022
None on record
Faye Louise Osmond Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Grace Caroline Angove Trustee 09 February 2023
None on record
Steven Mark Ball Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Heather Ball Trustee 22 July 2021
None on record
Melanie Green Trustee 15 July 2020
None on record
Joe Simes Trustee 02 September 2019
None on record
SARAH CHALLIS Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
Steven Robert Osborn Trustee 20 June 2016
New Forest District Scout Association
Received: On time
CRAIG CHALLIS Trustee 17 October 2012
None on record
KERIE WALLACE Trustee
New Forest Solent District Scout Council
Overdue by 235 days