Trustees WINCHESTER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 302317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mendelsohn | Chair | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Ashby | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Lodge | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Floyd | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kama Miller-Gambie | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Archibald Safford | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Amelia Inglis | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Johnson | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Fraser | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Welland | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Stephen Robin Cook | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE MARTIN | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.