Trustees WESTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 302502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Kenneth Smithard | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angie Marie Brett | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Eleanor Fishwick | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nora Sashalmi | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Watson Hartfield | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Moody | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Perkins | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Briggs | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lucas | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ROSS WHEATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.