Trustees 1ST LONDON COLNEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302554
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annabel Zatko | Chair | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ildiko Godony | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Clewett | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hulatt | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Taylor | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pecout | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Camille Ward | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gary Langridge | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Butcher | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Burnett | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ivory | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH CHESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.