Accounts and annual returns RICKMANSWORTH AND CHORLEYWOOD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window