1ST ST ALBANS BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £39.10k £36.92k £35.20k £43.58k £33.21k
Total expenditure £20.87k £39.29k £17.34k £35.20k £39.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A