Accounts and annual returns JUBILEE FIELD

Charity number: 302852
Charity reporting is overdue by 1603 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 507 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 507 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 872 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 872 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1237 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1603 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1603 days