Trustees TYLER HILL MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 302872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIKKI CAROLINE RAYNER | Chair | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Cumming | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christian Holness | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Samantha Tovey | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Huggins | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SUSAN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA MARY SEEKINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNIE COVER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.