THE WALKER CRICKET GROUND

Charity number: 303006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £257.94k £408.21k £349.74k £271.74k £215.94k
Total expenditure £278.46k £276.77k £252.67k £285.72k £256.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A