Trustees HINCHINGBROOKE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 303341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Morgan Gould | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Harris | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Clark | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rob Jackson | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Littleford | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Gregorious | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Danny Anstee | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Thomas | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Newman | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Aidan Joy | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Tatum | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Owen | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Gerald Browning | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN LOAKES | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|||||
ARTHUR NORMAN TOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.