THE FAMILY CENTRE (DEAF CHILDREN)

Charity number: 1062339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £82.35k £48.65k £3.89k £10.16k £30.70k
Total expenditure £79.95k £69.16k £27.36k £36.96k £41.33k
Income from government contracts £33.65k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A