THE PORTHCURNO COLLECTIONS TRUST

Charity number: 1062233
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £674.06k £541.43k £1.17m £561.90k £888.86k
Total expenditure £861.10k £719.46k £639.85k £684.49k £1.10m
Income from government contracts £7.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £7.00k £7.00k £7.00k £73.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £151.77k £149.52k £876.36k £148.15k £62.84k
Income - Other trading activities £208.14k £196.92k £244.34k £216.27k £196.09k
Income - Charitable activities £285.11k £190.94k £40.18k £173.19k £597.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.16k £4.06k £12.38k £20.65k £27.72k
Income - Other £9.89k £0 £0 £3.64k £4.78k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £731.19k £629.20k £534.81k £631.25k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £129.90k £90.26k £105.04k £53.24k £69.30k
Expenditure - Governance £8.50k £6.92k £5.97k £8.30k £10.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £53.29k £10.64k £14.98k £793 £1.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0