Trustees KENT COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 303471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Desmond Peter Harris | Chair | 01 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Jamie Paul Lucas | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jools Ethan Elliott | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Lisa Thornton | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mia Elizabeth Sydney Glyn-Jones | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Everest | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Grant | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Nirav Patel | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Catherine Jane Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alex Matthew Bates | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Trill | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MARTIN | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Dean Malcolm Harding | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|||||
KENNETH RIDGWAY | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Roy Hogben JP | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||||
NEIL GEARING | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.