2ND SIDCUP (ST JOHN'S) GUIDE COMPANY AND BROWNIE PACK

Charity number: 303520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.62k £8.56k £9.04k £9.03k £7.80k
Total expenditure £3.73k £8.11k £7.89k £13.69k £6.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A