Governing document THE FRENCHAY TUCKETT SOCIETY
Charity number: 1066961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1996, AS AMENDED NOVEMBER 1997 AND 26 MAY 1998 AND 19 MAY 1999 AND 16 MAY 2001 AND 11 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE VILLAGE OF FRENCHAY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE CONSERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF LOCAL HISTORY MATERIALS KNOWN AS THE "TUCKETT COLLECTION"
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
VILLAGE OF FRENCHAY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.