THE BAREFOOT PROJECT

Charity number: 1062887
Charity reporting is 35 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not yet received
35 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not yet received
35 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)