Governing document Helping Relief Foundation
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEP 1996 AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 1997 AS AMENDED ON 23 JAN 2006 AS AMENDED ON 18 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAY 2014 as amended on 15 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION IN A PEACEFUL, HARMONIOUS AND TOLERANT WAY BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, EDUCATION & INTERACTION OR THROUGH PEACEFUL DIALOGUE AND OTHER SUCH PEACEFUL MEANS TO ALL REGARDLESS OF RACE, CREED, COLOUR OR GENDER. 2) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING, ADVISORY & SIMILAR SERVICES 3) TO RELIEVE AND ELLIVIATE THE POOREST PEOPLE IN NEED THROUGHOUT THE WORLD REGARDLESS OF RACE, RELIGION, CREED, COLOUR OR GENDER. 4) TO ADVANCE THE AWARENESS, EDUCATION & APPLICATION OF HEALTHY LIVING AND GOOD HEALTHCARE IN THE POORER COMMUNITIES/SOCIETIES AND TO PROMOTE MEDICAL AID AND SUCH SERVICES TO RELIEVE ILLNESSES & OUTBREAKS OF DISEASES BY THE PROVISION OF THE AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.