Trustees COASTLINE HOUSING LIMITED
Charity number: 1066916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gill Pipkin | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Tucker | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Prescott Treleaven | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Garth Barlow | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Marie Kemp | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Pears | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Harris | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andre | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Harrison | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allister Young | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.