14TH ACTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303619
Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £9.75k £9.90k £8.59k £8.50k £14.45k
Total expenditure £6.14k £5.70k £14.15k £8.03k £10.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A