Financial history 3RD HAYES (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.90k £5.59k £11.65k £10.91k £3.27k
Total expenditure £20.51k £8.93k £10.69k £11.54k £6.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A