GIRLGUIDING CHEAM VILLAGE DISTRICT

Charity number: 303840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.68k £7.82k £22.63k £7.44k £11.91k
Total expenditure £3.80k £9.47k £11.48k £4.66k £7.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.34k