Financial history 7TH WALTHAMSTOW SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303865
Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £12.48k £13.54k £15.47k £11.34k £16.14k
Total expenditure £12.86k £12.12k £13.21k £10.64k £17.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A