Trustees FILBY PLAYING FIELD
Charity number: 303949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN DAVID THOMPSON | Chair |
|
||||||
DEBORAH LOIS MOORE | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
AMY ROWNTREE | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LUCINDA JAYNE CHAPMAN | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD MICHAEL FRANKLIN | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BARBARA FRANKLIN | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LEONARD MORRIS | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER MICHAEL SESSIONS | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHRANCESCA HARRISON | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOY DENISE BALDRY | Trustee | 03 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEREK ALAN NICKER | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|||||
PERCY FREDERICK HUDSON | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID JAMES HARROD | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PAUL ELDERKIN | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA WEBB | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSS STANTON | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GEORGE BALDRY | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE THOMPSON | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN DOUGLAS GIBSON | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GAZE | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.