Trustees 1ST NORTH WALSHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 304145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Cowell | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bumfrey | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Reed | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Williams | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gail Spencer | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ally Burgess | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hoy | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Weekes | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aron Bailey | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.