Trustees BARBY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan John O'Reilly | Chair | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Janet Dover | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH EVANS | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Helen Richardson | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bart Springer | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Grange | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Reynolds | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA WEBB | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Ann Hives | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH NOEL INGRAM | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN VALERIE LEPPARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER WHITT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.