Trustees BUCKBY WHARF VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Naomi Roll | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deana Loveridge | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Goff | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Catling | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Webb | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Goodman | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
pete Goodman | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Lyn Thomas | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leslie John Thomas | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
anna Wheeldon | Trustee | 03 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
sarah gardner | Trustee | 03 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
Alan Robert Webb | Trustee | 03 January 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.