THE JOHN HODGES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 304313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.05k £13.92k £14.51k £16.04k £18.30k
Total expenditure £6.03k £12.85k £14.93k £19.97k £24.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A