Financial history 10TH OXFORD BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 304435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.93k £11.36k £13.10k £10.23k £18.79k
Total expenditure £6.76k £8.96k £8.67k £13.42k £9.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.91k