Financial history 40TH OXFORD (KENNINGTON) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 304439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.66k £11.94k £13.03k £14.99k £26.74k
Total expenditure £7.87k £14.97k £15.57k £18.20k £7.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.91k